Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sanitary Districts -see also- Wash Sub Sanitary District

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796
Title
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Executive Director and General Counsel - Appointment and Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 (SB0928/CH0212)
Title
Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 /CH0033
Title
Employees' Pension System - Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Eligible Governmental Unit
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509
Title
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Purpose, Appointments, and Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 /CH0212 (HB1273)
Title
Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0796 Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Executive Director and General Counsel - Appointment and Compensation Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1273 (SB0928/CH0212) Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0442 /CH0033 Employees' Pension System - Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Eligible Governmental Unit Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Purpose, Appointments, and Compensation Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 /CH0212 (HB1273) Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM