Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 (SB0286)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530 (SB0359)
Title
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684
Title
Tobacco-Free Schools Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171 /CH0672 (SB1011)
Title
Cecil County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415
Title
Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0286 (HB0284)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359 (HB0530)
Title
Education - School Vehicle Attendant
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011 (HB1171/CH0672)
Title
Cecil County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0284 (SB0286) Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0530 (SB0359) Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0684 Tobacco-Free Schools Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1171 /CH0672 (SB1011) Cecil County - School Buses - Length of Operation Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 672
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1415 Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and Equipment Delegate Myers 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
SB0286 (HB0284) Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0359 (HB0530) Education - School Vehicle Attendant Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-3)
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1011 (HB1171/CH0672) Cecil County - School Buses - Length of Operation Cecil County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM