Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 (SB0159)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440 /CH0268 (SB0058/CH0267)
Title
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034 (SB0901/CH0358)
Title
Kent County and Queen Anne's County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Queen Anne's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208 (SB0866)
Title
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1234 (SB0870)
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0267 (HB0440/CH0268)
Title
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0133)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866 (HB1208)
Title
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 (HB1234)
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia Near School Property - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0901 /CH0358 (HB1034)
Title
Kent County and Queen Anne's County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 (SB0159) Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0440 /CH0268 (SB0058/CH0267) Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1034 (SB0901/CH0358) Kent County and Queen Anne's County - School Buses - Length of Operation Queen Anne's County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1208 (SB0866) Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1234 (SB0870) Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - Penalties Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 /CH0267 (HB0440/CH0268) Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0159 (HB0133) Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0866 (HB1208) Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0870 (HB1234) Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia Near School Property - Penalties Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0901 /CH0358 (HB1034) Kent County and Queen Anne's County - School Buses - Length of Operation Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM