Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 (SB0120)
Title
Harford County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471
Title
School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 /CH0427
Title
Montgomery County - Education - School Bus - Doors That Lock MC 27-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025
Title
School Vehicles - Right Turn on Red - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0120 (HB0125)
Title
Harford County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0125 (SB0120) Harford County - School Buses - Length of Operation Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0471 School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0510 /CH0427 Montgomery County - Education - School Bus - Doors That Lock MC 27-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 School Vehicles - Right Turn on Red - Prohibition Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0120 (HB0125) Harford County - School Buses - Length of Operation Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM