Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023 (SB0341/CH0696)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Repeat Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259 (SB0264)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Public School Buses - Exemption From Tolls
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 /CH0683
Title
School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0341
Title
Maryland Student Transportation Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495 (SB0154/CH0744)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943 (SB0990)
Title
Education - Privately Contracted School Bus Drivers - Annual Physical Examination Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1477
Title
Motor Vehicles - Wireless Communication Devices - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 /CH0744 (HB0495)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155
Title
School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 (HB0259)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Public School Buses - Exemption From Tolls
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0341 /CH0696 (HB0023)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0342
Title
Driver's Licenses - School Bus Drivers - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0990 (HB0943)
Title
Education - Privately Contracted School Bus Drivers - Annual Physical Examination Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 (SB0341/CH0696) Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Delegate Lam 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0186 Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Repeat Violations Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
HB0259 (SB0264) Maryland Transportation Authority - Public School Buses - Exemption From Tolls Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0263 /CH0683 School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification Requirement Delegate Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0341 Maryland Student Transportation Safety Act Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0495 (SB0154/CH0744) Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0943 (SB0990) Education - Privately Contracted School Bus Drivers - Annual Physical Examination Requirement Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1477 Motor Vehicles - Wireless Communication Devices - Prohibited Acts Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 /CH0744 (HB0495) Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0155 School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0264 (HB0259) Maryland Transportation Authority - Public School Buses - Exemption From Tolls Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0341 /CH0696 (HB0023) Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 696
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0342 Driver's Licenses - School Bus Drivers - Requirements Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0990 (HB0943) Education - Privately Contracted School Bus Drivers - Annual Physical Examination Requirement Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM