Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 /CH0115 (SB0215/CH0116)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343 (SB0464/CH0429)
Title
School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty - Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877
Title
Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Sentences
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 /CH0492
Title
School Bus Transition – Zero–Emission Vehicles – Grant Program and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286
Title
School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland's Future
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0116 (HB0276/CH0115)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0464 /CH0429 (HB0343)
Title
School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty - Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0276 /CH0115 (SB0215/CH0116) Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation Allegany County Delegation 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0343 (SB0464/CH0429) School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty - Sunset Repeal Delegate Lopez 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0877 Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Sentences Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 /CH0492 School Bus Transition – Zero–Emission Vehicles – Grant Program and Fund Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1286 School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts - Pilot Program Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771) The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Ways and Means
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 /CH0116 (HB0276/CH0115) Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0464 /CH0429 (HB0343) School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty - Sunset Repeal Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0837 Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413) The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 4:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM