Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

School Testing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0092)
Title
Accountability in Education Act of 2019
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118 /CH0581
Title
Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - In-State Tuition
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0195
Title
Prince George’s County Board of Education – Financial Literacy Pilot Program Course PG 504–19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205
Title
Higher Education - Academic Forgiveness Policy - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0206 (SB0188)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948
Title
Education - Advanced Placement Examination Fees - State Payment
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 /CH0548
Title
State Board of Education - Public High School Students - Assessments and Graduation Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1138
Title
State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Course and Exam - Graduation Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315 /CH0455 (SB0432/CH0454)
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365 (SB0502)
Title
Education - Workforce Development Sequence Scholarship - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland's Future
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011 /CH0082
Title
Distressed Counties - References and Definitions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 (HB0045)
Title
Accountability in Education Act of 2019
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 (HB0206)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice Policy
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 /CH0454 (HB1315/CH0455)
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0502 (HB1365)
Title
Education - Workforce Development Sequence Scholarship - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544
Title
Education - No-Zero Grading Policy - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 /CH0512 (HB0690)
Title
Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0757
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Assessments - Limitation of Administration (One Day in May Act)
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 (SB0092) Accountability in Education Act of 2019 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0118 /CH0581 Higher Education - Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - In-State Tuition Delegate Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Appropriations
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0195 Prince George’s County Board of Education – Financial Literacy Pilot Program Course PG 504–19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0205 Higher Education - Academic Forgiveness Policy - Established Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0206 (SB0188) Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice Policy Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0948 Education - Advanced Placement Examination Fees - State Payment Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1019 /CH0548 State Board of Education - Public High School Students - Assessments and Graduation Requirements Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Ways and Means
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1138 State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Course and Exam - Graduation Requirement Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1315 /CH0455 (SB0432/CH0454) Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Appropriations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1365 (SB0502) Education - Workforce Development Sequence Scholarship - Eligibility Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771) The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Ways and Means
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0011 /CH0082 Distressed Counties - References and Definitions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Finance
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0092 (HB0045) Accountability in Education Act of 2019 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0188 (HB0206) Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice Policy Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0432 /CH0454 (HB1315/CH0455) Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0502 (HB1365) Education - Workforce Development Sequence Scholarship - Eligibility Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0544 Education - No-Zero Grading Policy - Prohibition Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0734 /CH0512 (HB0690) Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0757 Primary and Secondary Education - Assessments - Limitation of Administration (One Day in May Act) Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413) The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 4:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM