Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Search and Seizure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 (SB0531)
Title
Criminal Law - Access to Firearms - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147
Title
Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219 (SB0259)
Title
Criminal Procedure - No-Knock Search Warrants - Prior Notification of County
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302
Title
Maryland Medical Marijuana Act
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Foreign Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713 /CH0636
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Location Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010
Title
Public Safety - Inappropriate Search of Minor by Public Servant - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Application and Affidavit
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191 (SB0623)
Title
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0946)
Title
Issuance of Search Warrant by Electronic Means Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233
Title
Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Agencies - Use of Drones
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255
Title
Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 (HB0219)
Title
Criminal Procedure - No-Knock Search Warrants - Prior Notification of County
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0427 (HB0294)
Title
Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382
Title
Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Surrender of Firearms
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0131)
Title
Criminal Law - Access to Firearms - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623 (HB1191)
Title
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946 (HB1232)
Title
Issuance of Search Warrant by Electronic Means Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0131 (SB0531) Criminal Law - Access to Firearms - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0147 Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and Disposition Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0219 (SB0259) Criminal Procedure - No-Knock Search Warrants - Prior Notification of County Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0302 Maryland Medical Marijuana Act Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0540 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Foreign Entities Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0713 /CH0636 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Location Privacy Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1010 Public Safety - Inappropriate Search of Minor by Public Servant - Penalties Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Delegate Hammen 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1106 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Application and Affidavit Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1191 (SB0623) Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB1232 (SB0946) Issuance of Search Warrant by Electronic Means Act of 2013 Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1233 Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Agencies - Use of Drones Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 (HB0219) Criminal Procedure - No-Knock Search Warrants - Prior Notification of County Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0281 /CH0427 (HB0294) Firearm Safety Act of 2013 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0382 Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Surrender of Firearms Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0531 (HB0131) Criminal Law - Access to Firearms - Penalties Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0623 (HB1191) Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Senator Conway 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0946 (HB1232) Issuance of Search Warrant by Electronic Means Act of 2013 Senator Robey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM