Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Search and Seizure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 (SB0443)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029 (SB0554)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030
Title
Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizures and Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060
Title
Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785
Title
Drones - Unauthorized Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 (SB0926)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB0658)
Title
Marijuana Control Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912 /CH0242 (SB0924)
Title
Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003
Title
Criminal Procedure - Individual With Immigration Detainer (Maryland Law Enforcement and Public Safety Trust Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1074
Title
Fourth Amendment Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1109 /CH0107
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1124 /CH0199
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Dangerous or Wild Animals
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Marijuana - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 (SB0698/CH0191)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - Order
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1189
Title
Public Safety - Inappropriate Search of Minor by Public Servant - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227
Title
Law Enforcement Procedures - Traffic Stops and Safety Checkpoints
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0028)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0029)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB0880)
Title
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 /CH0191 (HB1161)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - Order
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728
Title
Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers - Background Checks
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 /CH0198
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Dangerous or Wild Animals
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 (HB0912/CH0242)
Title
Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB0847)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 (SB0443) Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0029 (SB0554) Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0030 Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizures and Disposition Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0060 Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013 Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0785 Drones - Unauthorized Surveillance Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0847 (SB0926) Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0880 (SB0658) Marijuana Control Act of 2014 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0912 /CH0242 (SB0924) Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy Delegate Smigiel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1003 Criminal Procedure - Individual With Immigration Detainer (Maryland Law Enforcement and Public Safety Trust Act) Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1074 Fourth Amendment Protection Act Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1109 /CH0107 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Procedures Delegate Swain 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1124 /CH0199 Criminal Law - Possession of Dangerous or Wild Animals Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1126 Criminal Law - Synthetic Marijuana - Prohibition Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 (SB0698/CH0191) Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - Order Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1189 Public Safety - Inappropriate Search of Minor by Public Servant - Penalties Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1227 Law Enforcement Procedures - Traffic Stops and Safety Checkpoints Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 (HB0028) Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Reporting Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB0029) Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 (HB0880) The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0698 /CH0191 (HB1161) Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - Order Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0728 Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers - Background Checks Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 /CH0198 Criminal Law - Possession of Dangerous or Wild Animals Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0924 (HB0912/CH0242) Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0926 (HB0847) Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM