Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Search and Seizure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0173)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 (SB0528)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362 (SB0393)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 (SB0838/CH0386)
Title
St. Mary's County - Animal Regulations
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713
Title
Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelter Standards Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918 (SB0727)
Title
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 (SB0686)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Full Names
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0338)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0362)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 (HB0360)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 (HB1059)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0727 (HB0918)
Title
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0838 /CH0386 (HB0616)
Title
St. Mary's County - Animal Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0338 (SB0173) Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0360 (SB0528) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (87-51)
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0362 (SB0393) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0487 Maryland Education Credit Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 (SB0838/CH0386) St. Mary's County - Animal Regulations St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0659 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0713 Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - Prohibition Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0876 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelter Standards Act of 2015) Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0918 (SB0727) Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1059 (SB0686) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1284 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Full Names Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0173 (HB0338) Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0393 (HB0362) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 (HB0360) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Senator Raskin 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2016
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0686 (HB1059) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0727 (HB0918) Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0838 /CH0386 (HB0616) St. Mary's County - Animal Regulations Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM