Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Search and Seizure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0061 (SB0152/CH0062)
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 (SB0135)
Title
Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0771)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0779)
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032
Title
Correctional Services - Female Inmates and Inmates With Minor Children (Dignity for Incarcerated Women Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1417
Title
Public Safety - Task Force on Missing Persons
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0139)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152 /CH0062 (HB0135/CH0061)
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0656)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0779 (HB0839)
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843
Title
Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 /CH0061 (SB0152/CH0062) Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0139 (SB0135) Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0656 (SB0771) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0839 (SB0779) Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1032 Correctional Services - Female Inmates and Inmates With Minor Children (Dignity for Incarcerated Women Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1417 Public Safety - Task Force on Missing Persons Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0135 (HB0139) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0152 /CH0062 (HB0135/CH0061) Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0771 (HB0656) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0779 (HB0839) Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0843 Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM