Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Search and Seizure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069
Title
Criminal Procedure - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention - Reporting of Seizures and Forfeitures
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388
Title
Criminal Procedure - Civil Immigration Enforcement - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732
Title
Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085 (SB0468)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Appeals - Unlawful Possession of a Firearm
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1395
Title
Public Safety – Persistent Aerial Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1612 (SB0901)
Title
State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1622
Title
Baltimore City - Police Officers - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB1085)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Appeals - Unlawful Possession of a Firearm
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0901 (HB1612)
Title
State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0972
Title
Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0069 Criminal Procedure - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention - Reporting of Seizures and Forfeitures Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0388 Criminal Procedure - Civil Immigration Enforcement - Restrictions Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0732 Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
HB1085 (SB0468) Criminal Procedure - Appeals - Unlawful Possession of a Firearm Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1395 Public Safety – Persistent Aerial Surveillance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1612 (SB0901) State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1622 Baltimore City - Police Officers - Jurisdiction Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0468 (HB1085) Criminal Procedure - Appeals - Unlawful Possession of a Firearm Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0698 Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0901 (HB1612) State and Local Government - Participation in Federal Immigration Enforcement Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0972 Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1010 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/24/2020 8:01 AM