Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Secretary of State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230 (SB0236/CH0283)
Title
Constitutional Officers - Salaries
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 /CH0345 (SB0818/CH0344)
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Maryland Congressional Redistricting Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352 /CH0654 (SB0964)
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and Apportionment
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007 (SJ0006)
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0283 (HB0230)
Title
Constitutional Officers - Salaries
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 /CH0344 (HB0559/CH0345)
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1352/CH0654)
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0007)
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0230 (SB0236/CH0283) Constitutional Officers - Salaries Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0559 /CH0345 (SB0818/CH0344) State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0970 General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Maryland Congressional Redistricting Commission Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1352 /CH0654 (SB0964) Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HJ0004 United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and Apportionment Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0007 (SJ0006) United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0236 /CH0283 (HB0230) Constitutional Officers - Salaries President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0818 /CH0344 (HB0559/CH0345) State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Senator Forehand 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0964 (HB1352/CH0654) Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SJ0006 (HJ0007) United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM