Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Secretary of State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150 /CH0073
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets - Workgroup Reports - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 (SB0204/CH0332)
Title
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Domestic Violence - Confidentiality Program - Name of Victim
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 (SJ0002)
Title
United States Constitution - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Constitutional Officers - Forfeiture of Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 /CH0332 (HB0396)
Title
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 (HJ0002)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0150 /CH0073 Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets - Workgroup Reports - Extension Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0396 (SB0204/CH0332) Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year Delegate Turner 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1186 Domestic Violence - Confidentiality Program - Name of Victim Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1265 Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief Delegate West 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0002 (SJ0002) United States Constitution - Democracy Amendment Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0099 Congressional Districting Process Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0165 State Retirement and Pension System - Constitutional Officers - Forfeiture of Benefits Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
SB0204 /CH0332 (HB0396) Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SJ0002 (HJ0002) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM