Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Secretary of State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005
Title
Department of General Services - Declaration and Disposal of Excess and Surplus Property - Government House Furnishings
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458 (SB0380)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111
Title
Notary Public - Electronic and Remote Notary Services
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 (SJ0002)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0342
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167
Title
State Government - Notaries Public - Online Application System
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236
Title
State Government - Notary Public - Appointment and Removal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 (HB0458)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0542 /CH0220
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Forfeiture of Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1159 /CH0026
Title
Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners - Members - Terms and Appointment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 (HJ0008)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 Department of General Services - Declaration and Disposal of Excess and Surplus Property - Government House Furnishings Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0174 Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0458 (SB0380) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1111 Notary Public - Electronic and Remote Notary Services Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0008 (SJ0002) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 /CH0342 Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0167 State Government - Notaries Public - Online Application System Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0236 State Government - Notary Public - Appointment and Removal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0380 (HB0458) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0474 Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0542 /CH0220 State Retirement and Pension System - Forfeiture of Benefits Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1159 /CH0026 Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners - Members - Terms and Appointment Senator Conway 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2016 - 12:00 PM
SJ0002 (HJ0008) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM