Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Secretary of State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 /CH0586 (SB0310/CH0587)
Title
Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 (SB0747)
Title
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 /CH0587 (HB0390/CH0586)
Title
Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB0939)
Title
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0390 /CH0586 (SB0310/CH0587) Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0939 (SB0747) State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 Legislative and Congressional Districting Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0146 Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0310 /CH0587 (HB0390/CH0586) Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0747 (HB0939) State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process Senator Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-45)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM