Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Secretary of State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141 (SB0782)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 (SB0307)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 /CH0423 (SB0578/CH0424)
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985 (SB0280)
Title
Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1494 (SB0964)
Title
Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1703
Title
Election Law - Failure to File Campaign Finance Report or Affidavit - Injunctive Relief
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0011 (SJ0007)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0668
Title
Charitable Organizations - Registration Late Fees - Distribution and Use
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247
Title
State Government - Notaries Public - Travel Fees
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 (HB0985)
Title
Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 (HB0356)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423)
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0782 (HB0141)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1494)
Title
Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0007 (HJ0011)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0141 (SB0782) State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0255 Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Shielding of Real Property Records Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0356 (SB0307) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0633 /CH0423 (SB0578/CH0424) Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0985 (SB0280) Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1494 (SB0964) Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot Program Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1703 Election Law - Failure to File Campaign Finance Report or Affidavit - Injunctive Relief Delegate West 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0011 (SJ0007) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/05/2018 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0086 /CH0668 Charitable Organizations - Registration Late Fees - Distribution and Use Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0247 State Government - Notaries Public - Travel Fees Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0280 (HB0985) Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic Notarization Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 (HB0356) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423) Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0782 (HB0141) State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0964 (HB1494) Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and Reports Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SJ0007 (HJ0011) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM