Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Secretary of State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938 (SB0698)
Title
Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985
Title
Election Law – State Officials – Recall Election
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013
Title
General Provisions – Standard Time – Year–Round Daylight Saving Time
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Maryland Judiciary - Personal Identifying Information - Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0124
Title
Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360
Title
State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 (HB0938)
Title
Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners Disciplinary Process and Actions Report
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840
Title
General Provisions – Full Year Daylight Savings Time
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0938 (SB0698) Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0985 Election Law – State Officials – Recall Election Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1013 General Provisions – Standard Time – Year–Round Daylight Saving Time Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 Maryland Judiciary - Personal Identifying Information - Protection Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1360 State Government - Notarial Acts - Fees Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0109 /CH0124 Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0360 State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0698 (HB0938) Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0836 State Board of Dental Examiners Disciplinary Process and Actions Report Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0840 General Provisions – Full Year Daylight Savings Time Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/19/2021 11:14 AM
Click to return on the top page