Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Security Deposits

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0337)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090 /CH0327 (SB0849/CH0326)
Title
Public Utilities - Consumer Relations - Tenant Payment of Landlord Utility Bills
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413 /CH0595 (SB0969/CH0594)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 (HB0045)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 /CH0326 (HB1090/CH0327)
Title
Public Utilities - Consumer Relations - Tenant Payment of Landlord Utility Bills
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 /CH0594 (HB1413/CH0595)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 (SB0337) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1090 /CH0327 (SB0849/CH0326) Public Utilities - Consumer Relations - Tenant Payment of Landlord Utility Bills Delegate Barnes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1413 /CH0595 (SB0969/CH0594) Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0337 (HB0045) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 /CH0326 (HB1090/CH0327) Public Utilities - Consumer Relations - Tenant Payment of Landlord Utility Bills Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0969 /CH0594 (HB1413/CH0595) Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM