Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Security Deposits

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0471 (SB0436/CH0472)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 /CH0261
Title
Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0472 (HB1003/CH0471)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1003 /CH0471 (SB0436/CH0472) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Economic Matters
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0095 /CH0261 Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 /CH0472 (HB1003/CH0471) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM