Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Security Interests -see also- Liens; Mechanics' Liens

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 /CH0370
Title
Personal Property Tax - Liens for Unpaid Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621 /CH0625 (SB0627)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 (SB0763)
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225
Title
Criminal Law - Drive-By Shooting - Forfeiture of Motor Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1455 /CH0687
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028
Title
Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627 (HB0621/CH0625)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 (HB0954)
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830
Title
Transportation Financing Act
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0419 /CH0370 Personal Property Tax - Liens for Unpaid Tax Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0621 /CH0625 (SB0627) Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0954 (SB0763) Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1225 Criminal Law - Drive-By Shooting - Forfeiture of Motor Vehicle Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1455 /CH0687 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0028 Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 (HB0621/CH0625) Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0763 (HB0954) Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0830 Transportation Financing Act Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM