Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Securities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585 /CH0505 (SB0599/CH0504)
Title
Procurement - Subcontractor Equal Access to Bonding Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 (SB0578)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Worcester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0919)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Required Security
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1166 (SB0777/CH0321)
Title
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and Reinsurance
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1278
Title
Corporations and Associations - "Crowdfunding" Laws - Restrictions and Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 (HB0882)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599 /CH0504 (HB0585/CH0505)
Title
Procurement - Subcontractor Equal Access to Bonding Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777 /CH0321 (HB1166)
Title
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and Reinsurance
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 /CH0568
Title
Environment - Gas and Oil Drilling - Financial Assurance
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1051
Title
Maryland Private Sector Employees Pension Plan Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1072 /CH0345
Title
Linked Deposit Programs for Small Businesses and Minority Business Enterprises
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0585 /CH0505 (SB0599/CH0504) Procurement - Subcontractor Equal Access to Bonding Act of 2013 Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0882 (SB0578) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0999 Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Worcester County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1089 (SB0919) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Required Security Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Finance
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1166 (SB0777/CH0321) Insurance - Ceding Insurers and Reinsurance Delegate Davis 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1278 Corporations and Associations - "Crowdfunding" Laws - Restrictions and Compliance Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 (HB0882) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0599 /CH0504 (HB0585/CH0505) Procurement - Subcontractor Equal Access to Bonding Act of 2013 Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0777 /CH0321 (HB1166) Insurance - Ceding Insurers and Reinsurance Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0854 /CH0568 Environment - Gas and Oil Drilling - Financial Assurance Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1051 Maryland Private Sector Employees Pension Plan Task Force Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1072 /CH0345 Linked Deposit Programs for Small Businesses and Minority Business Enterprises Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2013 - 10:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM