Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Securities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207 /CH0408 (SB0106)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Investment Options - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0521 (SB0459)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 /CH0256 (SB0681)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576
Title
Maryland Local Stock Market and Social Stock Exchange Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 (SB0153)
Title
Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1166 (SB0577)
Title
Public Utilities - Telecommunications Law - Modernization
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 (HB0207/CH0408)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Investment Options - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 (HB0885)
Title
Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 (HB0521)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0577 (HB1166)
Title
Public Utilities - Telecommunications Law - Modernization
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 (HB0522/CH0256)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751
Title
Washington County - Board of Education - Financing Authority
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924
Title
County Boards of Education - Private Financing Authority
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0207 /CH0408 (SB0106) Chesapeake Bay Trust - Investment Options - Expansion Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0521 (SB0459) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0522 /CH0256 (SB0681) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0576 Maryland Local Stock Market and Social Stock Exchange Task Force Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0885 (SB0153) Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1166 (SB0577) Public Utilities - Telecommunications Law - Modernization Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Judiciary
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0106 (HB0207/CH0408) Chesapeake Bay Trust - Investment Options - Expansion Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0153 (HB0885) Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0379 Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0459 (HB0521) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity from Liability Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0577 (HB1166) Public Utilities - Telecommunications Law - Modernization Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 (HB0522/CH0256) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0751 Washington County - Board of Education - Financing Authority Washington County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
SB0924 County Boards of Education - Private Financing Authority Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM