Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Securities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 /CH0252
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions Received
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 /CH0482
Title
Housing and Community Development - Business Lending and Neighborhood Revitalization
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336 /CH0619 (SB0161/CH0658)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 /CH0171 (SB0148/CH0170)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 (SB0622)
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684 /CH0029 (SB0558)
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 (SB0801)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 (SB0751)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513 (SB1056)
Title
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 (SJ0006)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 /CH0170 (HB0354/CH0171)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 /CH0658 (HB0336/CH0619)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 /CH0182
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501
Title
Shareholders United Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0684/CH0029)
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 (HB0471)
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 (HB0796)
Title
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982 /CH0459
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Private Equity and Venture Capital Investments
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 (HB1513)
Title
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0002)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0112 /CH0252 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions Received Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0326 /CH0482 Housing and Community Development - Business Lending and Neighborhood Revitalization Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0336 /CH0619 (SB0161/CH0658) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Delegate Vallario 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0354 /CH0171 (SB0148/CH0170) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0471 (SB0622) Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0684 /CH0029 (SB0558) Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified Delegate Hammen 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0796 (SB0801) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0992 Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 (SB0751) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - Establishment Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1513 (SB1056) Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0002 (SJ0006) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0148 /CH0170 (HB0354/CH0171) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0161 /CH0658 (HB0336/CH0619) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Senator Hough 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 /CH0182 Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0500 Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0501 Shareholders United Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 (HB0684/CH0029) Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0622 (HB0471) Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 (HB0796) Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0982 /CH0459 State Retirement and Pension System - Private Equity and Venture Capital Investments Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1056 (HB1513) Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0006 (HJ0002) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM