Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Securities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 /CH0837 (SB0951/CH0838)
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1439 (SB0473/CH0080)
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638
Title
Employee Ownership Trusts
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0080 (HB1439)
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 /CH0508 (HB0236/CH0507)
Title
Legal Advice to Corporations - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 /CH0093 (HB0959/CH0094)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 /CH0838 (HB1149/CH0837)
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0859 Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and Exemptions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1149 /CH0837 (SB0951/CH0838) Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults Delegate Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1439 (SB0473/CH0080) Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1638 Employee Ownership Trusts Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268) State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption Senator Guzzone 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0473 /CH0080 (HB1439) Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 /CH0508 (HB0236/CH0507) Legal Advice to Corporations - Clarification Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0929 /CH0093 (HB0959/CH0094) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0951 /CH0838 (HB1149/CH0837) Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM