Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Securities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 /CH0732 (SB0754)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 /CH0100
Title
Insurance Regulation - Third Party Administrators - Life Insurance
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1266/CH0732)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0204 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 /CH0732 (SB0754) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established Delegate Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
SB0022 /CH0100 Insurance Regulation - Third Party Administrators - Life Insurance Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 (HB1266/CH0732) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM