Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Securities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 (SB1042)
Title
Courts - Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732
Title
Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0675)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 /CH0424 (SB0154/CH0423)
Title
Real Property – Recordation of Deeds – Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403
Title
Financial Institutions - State Banks - Investing in For-Profit Correctional Facilities - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499
Title
Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 /CH0423 (HB1084/CH0424)
Title
Real Property - Recordation of Deeds - Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB0990)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1042 (HB0379)
Title
Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0379 (SB1042) Courts - Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0732 Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
HB0990 (SB0675) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1084 /CH0424 (SB0154/CH0423) Real Property – Recordation of Deeds – Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 424
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1403 Financial Institutions - State Banks - Investing in For-Profit Correctional Facilities - Prohibited Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 /CH0423 (HB1084/CH0424) Real Property - Recordation of Deeds - Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 423
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0675 (HB0990) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1042 (HB0379) Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:17 PM