Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sediment Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 /CH0081
Title
Environment - Sediment Control and Stormwater Management Plans - Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400 (SB0364)
Title
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0325)
Title
Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control Standards
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623
Title
Environment - Sediment Control - Agricultural Land Management Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 /CH0384
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 /CH0139
Title
Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325 (HB0407)
Title
Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control Standards
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0364 (HB0400)
Title
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575 /CH0502
Title
Environment - Maryland Clean Water Fund - Annual Report
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1029 /CH0339
Title
Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0097 /CH0081 Environment - Sediment Control and Stormwater Management Plans - Authority Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0400 (SB0364) Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 (SB0325) Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control Standards Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0623 Environment - Sediment Control - Agricultural Land Management Practices Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0706 /CH0384 Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013 Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0766 /CH0139 Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - Certification Delegate Frush 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 (HB0407) Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control Standards Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0364 (HB0400) Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0575 /CH0502 Environment - Maryland Clean Water Fund - Annual Report Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1029 /CH0339 Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM