Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sediment Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 /CH0380 (SB0073)
Title
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878 /CH0430 (SB0814)
Title
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0910
Title
Water Quality Certification - Conowingo Dam - Required Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463 (SB1020)
Title
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0004)
Title
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 (HB0058/CH0380)
Title
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 (HB0878/CH0430)
Title
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020 (HB1463)
Title
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1116
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0006)
Title
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 /CH0380 (SB0073) Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0878 /CH0430 (SB0814) State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0910 Water Quality Certification - Conowingo Dam - Required Studies Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1463 (SB1020) Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0006 (SJ0004) Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 (HB0058/CH0380) Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain Violations Senator Colburn 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 (HB0878/CH0430) State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1020 (HB1463) Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1116 Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SJ0004 (HJ0006) Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM