Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sediment Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302 (SB0028)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599 /CH0439 (SB0839)
Title
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268 (SB0919)
Title
Environment - Implementation of Watershed Implementation Plan - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 (HB0302)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839 (HB0599/CH0439)
Title
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1268)
Title
Environment - Implementation of Watershed Implementation Plan - Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001
Title
Susquehanna River Basin - Sediment and Nutrient Pollution (National Chesapeake Bay Preservation Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0302 (SB0028) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0599 /CH0439 (SB0839) St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0633 Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation Plans Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1268 (SB0919) Environment - Implementation of Watershed Implementation Plan - Limitation Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0028 (HB0302) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2015 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0839 (HB0599/CH0439) St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0919 (HB1268) Environment - Implementation of Watershed Implementation Plan - Limitation Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SJ0001 Susquehanna River Basin - Sediment and Nutrient Pollution (National Chesapeake Bay Preservation Act of 2015) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2015 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM