Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sediment Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110 (SB0645)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 (SB0812)
Title
Sediment Control - Violations - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346 (SB0045)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 (HB1346)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0043
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645 (HB1110)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719
Title
Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Municipalities
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 (HB1240)
Title
Sediment Control - Violations - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1110 (SB0645) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1240 (SB0812) Sediment Control - Violations - Enforcement Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 (SB0045) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 (HB1346) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0061 /CH0043 Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and Clarifications Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0645 (HB1110) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of Funds Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0719 Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Municipalities Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0812 (HB1240) Sediment Control - Violations - Enforcement Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM