Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Sediment Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 (SB0450)
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0417)
Title
Power Plant Research Program – Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 (HB0777)
Title
Power Plant Research Program - Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450 (HB0631)
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663
Title
Charles County - Cemeteries - Sediment Control, Stormwater Management, and Forest Conservation
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0631 (SB0450) State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0777 (SB0417) Power Plant Research Program – Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity – Alterations Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0993 Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021 Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0417 (HB0777) Power Plant Research Program - Review of Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Alterations Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0450 (HB0631) State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0663 Charles County - Cemeteries - Sediment Control, Stormwater Management, and Forest Conservation Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/5/2021 6:44 PM
Click to return on the top page