Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sewage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011 /CH0080
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0379
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses - Local Entities
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937 /CH0432
Title
Wastewater Treatment Facilities - Distribution of Financial Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Elliott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0945
Title
Sewage Sludge - Permit Applications and Public Hearings - Notification Requirements
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973 /CH0628
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commission Infractions - Watershed Regulations PG/MC 102-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Upgrade of Facilities PG/MC 108-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Affordability Program PG/MC 103-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043 /CH0441
Title
Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075 /CH0639
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Definitions PG/MC 106-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1210 (SB0706)
Title
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1530 /CH0254
Title
St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission - Unpaid Charges
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1531 /CH0255
Title
St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission - Water and Sewer Service Charges - Volunteer Fire Departments and Rescue Squads - Exemption
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001
Title
Bay Restoration Fee - Exemption - On-Site Sewage Disposal System Using Best Available Technology
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fee - Mobile Home Park
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0706 (HB1210)
Title
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1071
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George's County Fair Share Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1084
Title
Baltimore County - Stormwater Remediation Fee - Application and Limitation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 /CH0080 Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0012 /CH0379 Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses - Local Entities Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0937 /CH0432 Wastewater Treatment Facilities - Distribution of Financial Assistance Delegate Elliott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0945 Sewage Sludge - Permit Applications and Public Hearings - Notification Requirements Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0973 /CH0628 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commission Infractions - Watershed Regulations PG/MC 102-14 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Upgrade of Facilities PG/MC 108-14 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0975 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Affordability Program PG/MC 103-14 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1043 /CH0441 Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1075 /CH0639 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Definitions PG/MC 106-14 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1210 (SB0706) Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1530 /CH0254 St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission - Unpaid Charges St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1531 /CH0255 St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission - Water and Sewer Service Charges - Volunteer Fire Departments and Rescue Squads - Exemption St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0001 Bay Restoration Fee - Exemption - On-Site Sewage Disposal System Using Best Available Technology Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 Environment - Bay Restoration Fee - Mobile Home Park Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0706 (HB1210) Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact Assessments Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1071 Montgomery County and Prince George's County Fair Share Act of 2014 Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1084 Baltimore County - Stormwater Remediation Fee - Application and Limitation Baltimore County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM