Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sewage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 /CH0093
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Operation and Maintenance Costs - Low-Income Homeowners
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 (SB0348)
Title
Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Water and Wastewater Charges - Billing Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 (SB0291)
Title
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by Counties
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742
Title
Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831 /CH0279 (SB0518)
Title
Washington County - Collection of Fees, Charges, Penalties, and Assessments
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0854 /CH0281
Title
State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water or Sewer Lines - Cost Sharing
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 /CH0638 (SB0815)
Title
Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101 /CH0131
Title
Municipal Corporations - Closed Swimming Lake - Regulation MC 32-16
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128 /CH0501
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing PG/MC 113-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1552
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 115-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 (HB0189)
Title
Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB0831/CH0279)
Title
Washington County - Collection of Fees, Charges, Penalties, and Assessments
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0815 (HB0989/CH0638)
Title
Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0090 /CH0093 On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Operation and Maintenance Costs - Low-Income Homeowners Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0189 (SB0348) Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0545 Landlord and Tenant - Water and Wastewater Charges - Billing Systems Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0604 (SB0291) Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by Counties Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0742 Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0831 /CH0279 (SB0518) Washington County - Collection of Fees, Charges, Penalties, and Assessments Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0854 /CH0281 State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water or Sewer Lines - Cost Sharing Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0989 /CH0638 (SB0815) Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1101 /CH0131 Municipal Corporations - Closed Swimming Lake - Regulation MC 32-16 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1128 /CH0501 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing PG/MC 113-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1552 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 115-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0348 (HB0189) Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and Inspection Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0518 (HB0831/CH0279) Washington County - Collection of Fees, Charges, Penalties, and Assessments Washington County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0815 (HB0989/CH0638) Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM