Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sewage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 (SB0096/CH0320)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190 /CH0342
Title
Environment - Failing On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202
Title
Department of the Environment - SepticSmart Week in Montgomery County MC 17-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0417 /CH0310
Title
Water Pollution Control – Notification of Sewer Overflows and Treatment Plant Bypasses – Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Department of the Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Environmental Hazards
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539 /CH0368
Title
Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562
Title
Montgomery County - Sale of Residential Real Property - Septic Systems Outreach Toolkit MC 16-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100 /CH0719 (SB0585/CH0720)
Title
State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0320 (HB0161)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0353
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Construction and Inspection Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 /CH0720 (HB1100/CH0719)
Title
State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses, Mandatory Appropriation, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 /CH0272
Title
Waterway Improvement Fund - Public Boating Construction Projects - Financing Limits
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0161 (SB0096/CH0320) Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019) Delegate Mosby 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0190 /CH0342 Environment - Failing On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Definition Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0202 Department of the Environment - SepticSmart Week in Montgomery County MC 17-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0417 /CH0310 Water Pollution Control – Notification of Sewer Overflows and Treatment Plant Bypasses – Alteration Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 Department of the Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Environmental Hazards Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0539 /CH0368 Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0562 Montgomery County - Sale of Residential Real Property - Septic Systems Outreach Toolkit MC 16-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0840 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1100 /CH0719 (SB0585/CH0720) State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1220 Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0096 /CH0320 (HB0161) Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019) Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0353 On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Construction and Inspection Licenses Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0585 /CH0720 (HB1100/CH0719) State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 720
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0851 Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses, Mandatory Appropriation, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 /CH0272 Waterway Improvement Fund - Public Boating Construction Projects - Financing Limits Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM