Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Sewage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121 /CH0066
Title
St. Mary’s County – Metropolitan Commission – Collection of Fees, Assessments, and Nonsubstantive and Clarifying Revisions
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0177 /CH0097
Title
Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700
Title
Highway Construction - Storm Drains - Covers and Task Force on Preventing Debris From Entering Storm Drains
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836
Title
Sewage Treatment Plants - Effluent Discharges - Impacts on Midge Populations
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 /CH0413 (SB0495)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund – Use of Funds – Municipal Wastewater Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 /CH0440
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297
Title
Individual Surface Water Discharge Permits - Study and Permit Decisions (Zombie Permit Elimination Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 (SB0877)
Title
Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406
Title
Land Use – Comprehensive Plan – Middle Housing (Planning for Modest Homes Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1416 (SB0820)
Title
Public Water Systems - Supplier Requirements (Water Quality Accountability Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0495 (HB1035/CH0413)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 /CH0570
Title
Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Allocation of Fees, Authorized Uses, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB1416)
Title
Public Water Systems - Supplier Requirements (Water Quality Accountability Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1330)
Title
Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 /CH0590
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0121 /CH0066 St. Mary’s County – Metropolitan Commission – Collection of Fees, Assessments, and Nonsubstantive and Clarifying Revisions St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 66
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0136 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0177 /CH0097 Environment – Water Infrastructure Assets – Authorization of Emergency Actions Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 97
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0700 Highway Construction - Storm Drains - Covers and Task Force on Preventing Debris From Entering Storm Drains Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0836 Sewage Treatment Plants - Effluent Discharges - Impacts on Midge Populations Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1035 /CH0413 (SB0495) Bay Restoration Fund – Use of Funds – Municipal Wastewater Facilities Delegate Adams 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 413
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1056 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1181 /CH0440 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1297 Individual Surface Water Discharge Permits - Study and Permit Decisions (Zombie Permit Elimination Act) Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 (SB0877) Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1406 Land Use – Comprehensive Plan – Middle Housing (Planning for Modest Homes Act of 2020) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1416 (SB0820) Public Water Systems - Supplier Requirements (Water Quality Accountability Act of 2020) Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0254 On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 285
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0495 (HB1035/CH0413) Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0628 /CH0570 Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Finance
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0671 Bay Restoration Fund - Allocation of Fees, Authorized Uses, and County Authority to Incur Indebtedness Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0820 (HB1416) Public Water Systems - Supplier Requirements (Water Quality Accountability Act of 2020) Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1330) Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0987 /CH0590 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:27 PM