Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sexual Orientation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 /CH0483 (SB0416/CH0482)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 /CH0134
Title
Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0834)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 /CH0482 (HB0838/CH0483)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0834 (HB0990)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0838 /CH0483 (SB0416/CH0482) Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services Delegate Hill 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0954 /CH0134 Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - Reports Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 (SB0834) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0416 /CH0482 (HB0838/CH0483) Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0834 (HB0990) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM