Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sexual Orientation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011 /CH0326 (SB0001/CH0325)
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0557 (SB0481/CH0556)
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142
Title
Education - Institutions of Higher Learning - Affirmative Consent Standard
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 (SB0751)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465
Title
Foster Care - Standards for Foster Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001 /CH0325 (HB0011/CH0326)
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 /CH0326 (SB0001/CH0325) Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - Exception Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 /CH0557 (SB0481/CH0556) Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1142 Education - Institutions of Higher Learning - Affirmative Consent Standard Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1172 (SB0751) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - Establishment Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1465 Foster Care - Standards for Foster Parents Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0001 /CH0325 (HB0011/CH0326) Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - Exception Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM