Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sexual Orientation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 (SB0539)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB1028/CH0685)
Title
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060
Title
Family Law - Same-Sex Couples - Marital Presumption and Expedited Second Parent Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory Harassment
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0786)
Title
Correctional Services – Restrictive Housing – Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1028 /CH0685 (HB0902)
Title
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0786 (SB0539) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0902 (SB1028/CH0685) Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act) Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report Adopted
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0060 Family Law - Same-Sex Couples - Marital Presumption and Expedited Second Parent Adoption Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0525 Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory Harassment Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0539 (HB0786) Correctional Services – Restrictive Housing – Limitations Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1028 /CH0685 (HB0902) Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act) Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM