Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Sexual Orientation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255 (SB0547)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488 (SB0554)
Title
Crimes – Mitigation – Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706
Title
Commission on LGBTQ Affairs - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010
Title
Health Care Facilities – Discrimination (LGBTQ Senior Bill of Rights)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120 /CH0428 (SB0738)
Title
Health Care Providers – Discrimination in Provision of Services
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Family Law – Removal of Child From Home – Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1561
Title
Discriminatory Housing Practices - Intent
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0547 (HB0255)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0488)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation - Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738 (HB1120/CH0428)
Title
Health Care Providers and Health Benefit Plans - Discrimination in Provision of Services
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0255 (SB0547) Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0488 (SB0554) Crimes – Mitigation – Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0706 Commission on LGBTQ Affairs - Established Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1010 Health Care Facilities – Discrimination (LGBTQ Senior Bill of Rights) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 /CH0428 (SB0738) Health Care Providers – Discrimination in Provision of Services Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 428
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1342 Family Law – Removal of Child From Home – Meetings Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1561 Discriminatory Housing Practices - Intent Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0547 (HB0255) Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB0488) Crimes - Mitigation - Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0738 (HB1120/CH0428) Health Care Providers and Health Benefit Plans - Discrimination in Provision of Services Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:48 PM