Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sheriffs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 (SB0331/CH0339)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369 (SB0383/CH0166)
Title
Public Safety - Appointment of Members of Fire Companies as Deputy Sheriffs - Caroline County and Talbot County
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873 /CH0284
Title
Charles County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 /CH0134
Title
Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumption - Duty Belt Worn by Law Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970 (SB0689/CH0047)
Title
Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 (SB0752)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204
Title
Anne Arundel County - Assistant to the Sheriff - Appointment
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219
Title
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259
Title
Cecil County - Community Adult Rehabilitation Center - Appointment and Removal of Assistant Director
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0323
Title
Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 /CH0339 (HB0012)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 /CH0166 (HB0369)
Title
Public Safety - Appointment of Members of Fire Companies as Deputy Sheriffs - Caroline County and Talbot County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 /CH0173
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0618 /CH0184
Title
Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 /CH0047 (HB0970)
Title
Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB0993)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 (SB0331/CH0339) Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0322 Harford County - Charitable Gaming Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0369 (SB0383/CH0166) Public Safety - Appointment of Members of Fire Companies as Deputy Sheriffs - Caroline County and Talbot County Caroline County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0873 /CH0284 Charles County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0954 /CH0134 Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - Reports Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0957 Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumption - Duty Belt Worn by Law Enforcement Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0970 (SB0689/CH0047) Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy Sheriffs Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 (SB0752) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1177 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1204 Anne Arundel County - Assistant to the Sheriff - Appointment Delegate Sophocleus 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1219 Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1259 Cecil County - Community Adult Rehabilitation Center - Appointment and Removal of Assistant Director Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0086 /CH0323 Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0331 /CH0339 (HB0012) Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0383 /CH0166 (HB0369) Public Safety - Appointment of Members of Fire Companies as Deputy Sheriffs - Caroline County and Talbot County Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 /CH0173 Harford County - Charitable Gaming Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0618 /CH0184 Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0689 /CH0047 (HB0970) Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy Sheriffs Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 (HB0993) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM