Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sheriffs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 (SB0926)
Title
Criminal Law and Procedure - Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224 (SB0742)
Title
State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 /CH0119 (SB0217/CH0120)
Title
Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 29-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769
Title
Harford County Parishioner Protection Pilot Program
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 /CH0256 (SB0349)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Safety - Special Police Officers Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Violent Offender Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0196
Title
Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 /CH0120 (HB0407/CH0119)
Title
Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287
Title
Handgun Qualification License - Training Requirement - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735
Title
State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742 (HB0224)
Title
State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB0131)
Title
Criminal Law and Procedure - Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 /CH0098
Title
Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0131 (SB0926) Criminal Law and Procedure - Animal Abuse Registry Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0224 (SB0742) State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0239 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Animal Abuse Registry Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 /CH0119 (SB0217/CH0120) Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0624 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 29-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0769 Harford County Parishioner Protection Pilot Program Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB0795 /CH0256 (SB0349) Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Economic Matters
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1018 St. Mary's County - Public Safety - Special Police Officers Pilot Program Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1023 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Violent Offender Registry Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1218 Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0206 /CH0196 Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0217 /CH0120 (HB0407/CH0119) Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0287 Handgun Qualification License - Training Requirement - Exemption Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0735 State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
SB0742 (HB0224) State and Local Government - Correctional Units - Detention Agreements and Contracting for Privatization of Facilities Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0926 (HB0131) Criminal Law and Procedure - Animal Abuse Registry Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0957 /CH0098 Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM