Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sheriffs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227 (SB0176)
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0265 (SB0156)
Title
Handgun Qualification License - Training Requirement - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433
Title
Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Response to Report of Alleged Domestic Violence - Authorization PG 309-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 /CH0260 (SB0138/CH0261)
Title
Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677 (SB0850)
Title
Correctional Services - Immigration Detention - Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 /CH0303
Title
Harford County – Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Detention and Correctional Officers and Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976
Title
Anne Arundel County - Service of Summary Ejectment Papers - Sheriff's Surcharge and Authorization for Private Process Server
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0889)
Title
Adjudicatory Hearings - Attorney Security Passes for Attorneys in Good Standing
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177 /CH0438 (SB0599/CH0439)
Title
Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259
Title
Anne Arundel County - Correctional Services - Removal From Court
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268
Title
Public Safety – Pilot Program – Handgun Permit – Church Property
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319 /CH0459
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1622
Title
Baltimore City - Police Officers - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 /CH0261 (HB0573/CH0260)
Title
Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156 (HB0265)
Title
Handgun Qualification License - Training Requirement - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176 (HB0227)
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599 /CH0439 (HB1177/CH0438)
Title
Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823
Title
Sheriff of Baltimore City - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 (HB0677)
Title
Correctional Services - Immigration Detention - Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 (HB1009)
Title
Adjudicatory Hearings - Attorney Security Passes for Attorneys in Good Standing
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0227 (SB0176) Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0265 (SB0156) Handgun Qualification License - Training Requirement - Exemption Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0433 Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Response to Report of Alleged Domestic Violence - Authorization PG 309-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0573 /CH0260 (SB0138/CH0261) Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 260
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0677 (SB0850) Correctional Services - Immigration Detention - Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0685 /CH0303 Harford County – Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Detention and Correctional Officers and Deputy Sheriffs Delegate Johnson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 303
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0976 Anne Arundel County - Service of Summary Ejectment Papers - Sheriff's Surcharge and Authorization for Private Process Server Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judiciary
HB0995 Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary Delegate Chang 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1009 (SB0889) Adjudicatory Hearings - Attorney Security Passes for Attorneys in Good Standing Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1177 /CH0438 (SB0599/CH0439) Sheriff of Harford County - Salary Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 438
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1259 Anne Arundel County - Correctional Services - Removal From Court Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judiciary
HB1268 Public Safety – Pilot Program – Handgun Permit – Church Property Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB1319 /CH0459 Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners Delegate Anderton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1322 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act) Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB1622 Baltimore City - Police Officers - Jurisdiction Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0138 /CH0261 (HB0573/CH0260) Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees Senator Cassilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 261
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2020 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0156 (HB0265) Handgun Qualification License - Training Requirement - Exemption Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0176 (HB0227) Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0599 /CH0439 (HB1177/CH0438) Sheriff of Harford County - Salary Harford County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0823 Sheriff of Baltimore City - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0850 (HB0677) Correctional Services - Immigration Detention - Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act) Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0889 (HB1009) Adjudicatory Hearings - Attorney Security Passes for Attorneys in Good Standing Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:37 PM