Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Shopping Centers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095 /CH0066
Title
City of Gaithersburg - Licensed Alcoholic Beverages Restaurants - Distance from Churches or Other Places of Worship MC 23-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235 /CH0231
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Distributors - Sale of Electric or Nonfossil-Fuel Burning Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0095 /CH0066 City of Gaithersburg - Licensed Alcoholic Beverages Restaurants - Distance from Churches or Other Places of Worship MC 23-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0105 Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0235 /CH0231 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Distributors - Sale of Electric or Nonfossil-Fuel Burning Vehicles Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0331 Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM