Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Shore Erosion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 /CH0236 (SB0939/CH0237)
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0213)
Title
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Mandatory Funding and Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406 /CH0362
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program - State-Owned Lakes - Structural Shoreline Stabilization
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427 /CH0442
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213 (HB0405)
Title
Natural Resources – State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Mandatory Funding and Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 /CH0236 (SB0939/CH0237) Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2019 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0405 (SB0213) Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Mandatory Funding and Repeal of Termination Date Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0406 /CH0362 Wetlands and Waterways Program - State-Owned Lakes - Structural Shoreline Stabilization Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1427 /CH0442 Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0213 (HB0405) Natural Resources – State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Mandatory Funding and Termination Date Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM