Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sidewalks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535 /CH0721 (SB0407/CH0722)
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0717 (SB0850/CH0718)
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977
Title
State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407 /CH0722 (HB0535/CH0721)
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 /CH0718 (HB0744/CH0717)
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0535 /CH0721 (SB0407/CH0722) Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment Delegate Lierman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 /CH0717 (SB0850/CH0718) Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0977 State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0407 /CH0722 (HB0535/CH0721) Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0850 /CH0718 (HB0744/CH0717) Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM