Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sidewalks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
State Highway Administration – Sidewalks Within Priority Funding Areas – Repair and Maintenance
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 /CH0572 (SB0116/CH0573)
Title
Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 (SB0804)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0573 (HB0082/CH0572)
Title
Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mobile Carrying Device - Definition
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0804 (HB0112)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 State Highway Administration – Sidewalks Within Priority Funding Areas – Repair and Maintenance Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2019 - 2:30 PM
HB0082 /CH0572 (SB0116/CH0573) Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0112 (SB0804) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0573 (HB0082/CH0572) Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
SB0603 Vehicle Laws - Mobile Carrying Device - Definition Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0804 (HB0112) Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM