Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Signatures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224 /CH0158 (SB0279/CH0157)
Title
Election Law - Improving Access to Voting
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331 /CH0612 (SB0826)
Title
Open Meetings Act - Violations and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0437 (SB0753)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 (SB0673)
Title
Referendum Integrity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0634
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 /CH0539 (SB0757/CH0538)
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - Complaints
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318
Title
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365 (SB0823)
Title
Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1457
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearm Application - Required Information and Warnings
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 (HB0493)
Title
Referendum Integrity Act
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0706
Title
Referendum Petitions
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0753 (HB0437)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0757 /CH0538 (HB0795/CH0539)
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - Complaints
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 (HB1365)
Title
Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 (HB0331/CH0612)
Title
Open Meetings Act - Violations and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0901
Title
Election Law - Elections by Mail
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0221 Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0224 /CH0158 (SB0279/CH0157) Election Law - Improving Access to Voting Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0331 /CH0612 (SB0826) Open Meetings Act - Violations and Penalties Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0437 (SB0753) Maryland Trust Act Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0493 (SB0673) Referendum Integrity Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0634 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Delegate Tarrant 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0795 /CH0539 (SB0757/CH0538) Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - Complaints Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Trust Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1365 (SB0823) Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1427 State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1457 Public Safety - Regulated Firearm Application - Required Information and Warnings Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0673 (HB0493) Referendum Integrity Act Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0706 Referendum Petitions Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0753 (HB0437) Maryland Trust Act Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0757 /CH0538 (HB0795/CH0539) Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - Complaints Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0823 (HB1365) Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0826 (HB0331/CH0612) Open Meetings Act - Violations and Penalties Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0901 Election Law - Elections by Mail Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM