Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Signatures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 /CH0585 (SB0240)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0427 /CH0403
Title
Education - Maryland Sudden Cardiac Arrest Awareness Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 /CH0345 (SB0818/CH0344)
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857
Title
Courts - Attorneys - Subpoena Procedures and Forms for Circuit Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 (SB0805/CH0342)
Title
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1412
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Advance Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1475
Title
Election Law - Signing a Petition - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0019
Title
Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Certification to Authorize Lobbying and Electronic Filing of Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 (HB0083/CH0585)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 /CH0342 (HB1052)
Title
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 /CH0344 (HB0559/CH0345)
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 /CH0585 (SB0240) Maryland Trust Act Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0125 Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0427 /CH0403 Education - Maryland Sudden Cardiac Arrest Awareness Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0559 /CH0345 (SB0818/CH0344) State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0857 Courts - Attorneys - Subpoena Procedures and Forms for Circuit Courts Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1052 (SB0805/CH0342) Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1412 Election Law - Petitions - Advance Determinations Delegate Bobo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1475 Election Law - Signing a Petition - Required Information Delegate Bobo 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0090 /CH0019 Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Certification to Authorize Lobbying and Electronic Filing of Registration Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0240 (HB0083/CH0585) Maryland Trust Act Senator Stone 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0339 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 /CH0342 (HB1052) Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0818 /CH0344 (HB0559/CH0345) State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Senator Forehand 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM