Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Signatures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 (SB0418/CH0030)
Title
Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682
Title
Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Referendum and Signatures Required for Petitions
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 (SB0676)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Election Law - Audits of Election Results
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106 /CH0297
Title
Public Health - Electronic Advance Directives - Witness Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 /CH0030 (HB0623)
Title
Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0618 /CH0184
Title
Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 (HB1021)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 (SB0418/CH0030) Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension Delegate Miele 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0682 Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Referendum and Signatures Required for Petitions Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 (SB0676) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1064 Election Law - Audits of Election Results Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1106 /CH0297 Public Health - Electronic Advance Directives - Witness Requirements Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 /CH0030 (HB0623) Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0618 /CH0184 Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 (HB1021) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page